TX HB61 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to highway maintenance or construction vehicles, certain service vehicles, and escort flag vehicles, including the use of certain lighting equipment on those vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to highway maintenance or construction vehicles, certain service vehicles, and escort flag vehicles, including the use of certain lighting equipment on those vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#769 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#97 (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-07 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-01 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-04-30SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-04-30HouseSigned in the House
2019-04-29HouseReported enrolled
2019-04-29HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#769
2019-04-29HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-04-18HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-04-18HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-04-18HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-04-02SenateRead first time
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-27HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-27HouseRecord vote RV#97
2019-03-27HousePassed
2019-03-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-26HousePassed to engrossment
2019-03-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-02-11HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB169 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback