TX HB62 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain meetings of a commissioners court during a disaster or emergency.
Title
Relating to certain meetings of a commissioners court during a disaster or emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] |
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1268 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1268 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Open Meetings
PUBLIC NOTICE
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Open Meetings
PUBLIC NOTICE