TX HB620 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a veterans suicide prevention public awareness campaign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a veterans suicide prevention public awareness campaign.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback