TX HB629 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Postponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to establishing a protective order registry and the duties of court personnel and other persons and entities in regard to the registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to establishing a protective order registry and the duties of court personnel and other persons and entities in regard to the registry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HousePostponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-23HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-15HousePostponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB325 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Committee report distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback