TX HB65 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to establishing a health science center and medical school in South Texas.
Title
Relating to establishing a health science center and medical school in South Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. Veronica Gonzales [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Rene Oliveira [D] |
Rep. Aaron Pena [D] | Rep. Tara Ybarra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-14 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-04 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB98 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BORDER
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER--SOUTH TEXAS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER--SOUTH TEXAS