TX HB65 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting information regarding public school disciplinary actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting information regarding public school disciplinary actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#263 (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Education
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#263
2019-04-10HousePassed
2019-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-02-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-11HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB304 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback