TX HB650 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Title
Relating to inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1355 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#240 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#240 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-13 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1355 |
2019-05-13 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#240 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 2-White |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment amended 3-Toth |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-White |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended 1-White |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Health
Health--General
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Women
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Health
Health--General
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Women