TX HB680 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Workforce Commission and local workforce development boards regarding the provision of child care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Workforce Commission and local workforce development boards regarding the provision of child care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1796 (Y: 91 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#593 (Y: 84 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#557 (Y: 85 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#556 (Y: 64 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 182
2019-05-24HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 182
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1796
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateAmended
2019-05-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Watson
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Education
2019-05-08SenateRead first time
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#593
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#557
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#556
2019-04-23HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Deshotel
2019-04-23HousePoint of order overruled (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-04-23HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Deshotel
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1002 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB680
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00680I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00680H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00680E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00680S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00680F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB680&RcdVtNo=556&Ch=H&Dt=04/23/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB680&RcdVtNo=557&Ch=H&Dt=04/23/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB680&RcdVtNo=593&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB680&RcdVtNo=1796&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019

Bill Comments

feedback