TX HB69 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 1/1/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the right to vacate and avoid liability under a residential lease after a tenant's death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the right to vacate and avoid liability under a residential lease after a tenant's death.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#687 (Y: 116 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Effective on 1/1/20
2019-06-15 Filed without the Governor's signature
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#687
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-24HouseAmended 1-Minjarez
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-02-11HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback