TX HB703 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the confidentiality of birth records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the confidentiality of birth records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback