TX HB723 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement that the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality obtain or develop updated water availability models for certain river basins.
Title
Relating to a requirement that the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality obtain or develop updated water availability models for certain river basins.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1343 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#247 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#247 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1343 |
2019-05-10 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#247 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB724 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Subjects
BRAZOS RIVER BASIN
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
GUADALUPE RIVER BASIN
NECHES RIVER BASIN
NUECES RIVER
RED RIVER
RIO GRANDE RIVER
SAN ANTONIO RIVER BASIN
SAN JACINTO RIVER
WATER
Water--General
Water--Rights
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
GUADALUPE RIVER BASIN
NECHES RIVER BASIN
NUECES RIVER
RED RIVER
RIO GRANDE RIVER
SAN ANTONIO RIVER BASIN
SAN JACINTO RIVER
WATER
Water--General
Water--Rights