TX HB73 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limitation on the use of a victim's gender identity or sexual orientation as the basis for a defense in the trial of a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to a limitation on the use of a victim's gender identity or sexual orientation as the basis for a defense in the trial of a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1510 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
Criminal Procedure--General
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
SEXUAL ORIENTATION
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
Criminal Procedure--General
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
SEXUAL ORIENTATION