TX HB744 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Medicaid eligibility of certain women after a pregnancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Medicaid eligibility of certain women after a pregnancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1322 (Y: 87 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1322
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB147 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback