TX HB75 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exception to the application of the offense of possessing or delivering drug paraphernalia for persons involved in certain pilot programs.
Title
Relating to an exception to the application of the offense of possessing or delivering drug paraphernalia for persons involved in certain pilot programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. William Zedler [R] |
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] | Rep. Terry Meza [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health--AIDS
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HONORABLE RUTH JONES MCCLENDON ACT
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health--AIDS
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HONORABLE RUTH JONES MCCLENDON ACT