TX HB759 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the availability of personal information of a child protective services caseworker, adult protective services caseworker, or investigator.
Title
Relating to the availability of personal information of a child protective services caseworker, adult protective services caseworker, or investigator.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] |
Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#251 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#251 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1494 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Protection of Personal Information
Safety
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Protection of Personal Information
Safety