TX HB785 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the execution of a warrant issued for certain individuals who violate a condition of release on parole or to mandatory supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the execution of a warrant issued for certain individuals who violate a condition of release on parole or to mandatory supervision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#127 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-04-04SenateRead first time
2019-04-03SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-02HouseRecord vote RV#127
2019-04-02HousePassed
2019-04-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback