TX HB799 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liability for certain damage caused by vehicles exceeding maximum height limitations; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to liability for certain damage caused by vehicles exceeding maximum height limitations; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Tom Craddick [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] |
Sen. Robert Nichols [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#299 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#299 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#299 |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BRIDGES & CAUSEWAYS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road