TX HB8 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution and punishment of offenses related to trafficking of persons and to certain protections for victims of trafficking of persons.
Title
Relating to the prosecution and punishment of offenses related to trafficking of persons and to certain protections for victims of trafficking of persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - HB 8Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-17 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-17 | House | Passed |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-16 | House | Amended |
2013-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PROSTITUTION
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
SEXUAL ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PROSTITUTION
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
SEXUAL ABUSE