TX HB802 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Postponed 6/27/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Postponed 6/27/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voting rights and eligibility for office of residents of certain districts subject to a strategic partnership agreement.
Title
Relating to voting rights and eligibility for office of residents of certain districts subject to a strategic partnership agreement.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Postponed 6/27/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/9/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 6:00 PM |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-07 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 7:00 AM |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Annexation
City Government--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
City Government--Annexation
City Government--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB802 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00802I.htm |