TX HB826 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the University of Houston College of Medicine at the University of Houston.
Title
Relating to the creation of the University of Houston College of Medicine at the University of Houston.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#129 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#129 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-04-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-02 | House | Record vote RV#129 |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB650 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM