TX HB828 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to credit toward payment of a fine and costs for certain misdemeanants confined in jail or prison before sentencing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to credit toward payment of a fine and costs for certain misdemeanants confined in jail or prison before sentencing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB336 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback