TX HB830 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the release by a peace officer of certain individuals suspected of the offense of public intoxication.
Title
Relating to the release by a peace officer of certain individuals suspected of the offense of public intoxication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-12 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 306 |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB306 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB830 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00830I.htm |