TX HB843 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of satisfactory performance on certain postsecondary readiness assessment instruments in the indicators for evaluating the performance of public schools.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of satisfactory performance on certain postsecondary readiness assessment instruments in the indicators for evaluating the performance of public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#597 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#597 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing