TX HB85 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Recommitted to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of indecency with a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of indecency with a child.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseRecommitted to committee
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-02-12HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1699 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback