TX HB869 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-10)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-10)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of organized criminal activity involving the interception, use, or disclosure of certain communications.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of organized criminal activity involving the interception, use, or disclosure of certain communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#210 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#210 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#210 |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB315 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems