TX HB876 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the model training curriculum and required training for school district peace officers and school resource officers.
Title
Relating to the model training curriculum and required training for school district peace officers and school resource officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1285 (Y: 83 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1285 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING