TX HB878 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limitation on increases in the appraised value of real property for ad valorem tax purposes.
Title
Relating to a limitation on increases in the appraised value of real property for ad valorem tax purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR47 (Enabling for) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
SB1086 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
SB1086 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB878 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00878I.htm |