TX HB888 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creating the criminal offense of misrepresenting a child as a family member at a port of entry.
Title
Relating to creating the criminal offense of misrepresenting a child as a family member at a port of entry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1775 (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#899 (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#898 (Y: 16 N: 123 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#899 (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#898 (Y: 16 N: 123 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1775 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#899 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 2-Canales |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Middleton |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Rodriguez and Hernandez |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
IMMIGRATION LAW
Minors
Minors--General
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
IMMIGRATION LAW
Minors
Minors--General