TX HB892 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to county regulation of game rooms.
Title
Relating to county regulation of game rooms.
Sponsors
Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Rep. Ernest Bailes [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Sen. Robert Nichols [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#373 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#373 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#373 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2092 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations