TX HB900 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the act of smoking tobacco in a vehicle with a child present; authorizing an additional fine for certain criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the act of smoking tobacco in a vehicle with a child present; authorizing an additional fine for certain criminal offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback