TX HB906 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a collaborative task force to study certain public school mental health services.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a collaborative task force to study certain public school mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1726 (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#636 (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Amended RV#567 (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Amendment amended RV#566 (Y: 93 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#636 (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Amended RV#567 (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Amendment amended RV#566 (Y: 93 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1726 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#636 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#567 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended 4-Dean |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 2-Klick |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#566 |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment amended 3-Talarico |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-Klick |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended 1-Klick |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-04-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB992 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Education
Subjects
COLLABORATIVE TASK FORCE ON PUBLIC SCHOOL MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Mental Health & Substance Abuse