TX HB918 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 1/1/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to providing discharged or released inmates with certain documents, including documents to assist the inmate in obtaining employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to providing discharged or released inmates with certain documents, including documents to assist the inmate in obtaining employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#934 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-02 Effective on 1/1/20
2019-06-02 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenatePassed
2019-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-03SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-03SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#934
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Corrections
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB461 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback