TX HB920 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the jurisdiction of the statutory county courts of Cooke County in family law matters.
Title
Relating to the jurisdiction of the statutory county courts of Cooke County in family law matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#514 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#514 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB654 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to State Affairs