TX HB938 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Pending: Senate Transportation & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Pending: Senate Transportation & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for women veterans.
Title
Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for women veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-25 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-06 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-02-24 | Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |
Subjects
LICENSE PLATES
Military & Veterans
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Women
Military & Veterans
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Women