TX HB938 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the capacity of certain minors to consent to maternal health care.
Title
Relating to the capacity of certain minors to consent to maternal health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. Jessica Farrar [D] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] | Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] |
Rep. Julie Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB149 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
FAMILY PLANNING & BIRTH CONTROL
Health Care Providers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Health Care Providers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH