TX HB953 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-19 - Co-sponsor authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain contributions by an open-enrollment charter school to the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain contributions by an open-enrollment charter school to the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#495 (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#439 (Y: 115 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#495
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#439
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback