TX HB975 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training requirements for a member of the board of trustees of an independent school district.
Title
Relating to training requirements for a member of the board of trustees of an independent school district.
Sponsors
Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1279 (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1279 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Safety
SCHOOL SAFETY CENTER, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Safety
SCHOOL SAFETY CENTER, TEXAS