TX HB98 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to civil and criminal liability for the unlawful disclosure of intimate visual material.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to civil and criminal liability for the unlawful disclosure of intimate visual material.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#704 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#704
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-02-12HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB342 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback