TX HB994 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to appeals to justice courts of certain ad valorem tax determinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to appeals to justice courts of certain ad valorem tax determinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1944 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#600 (Y: 137 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - RV#599 (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Amendment to amendment tabled RV#598 (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-26SenateHouse discharges conferees-reported
2019-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1944
2019-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-26HouseHouse discharges conferees
2019-05-21SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-21SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-21SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-20HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-20HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-15SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-25SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#600
2019-04-24HousePassed as amended
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#599
2019-04-24HouseAmended 1-Huberty
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#598
2019-04-24HouseAmendment to amendment tabled 2-Stickland
2019-04-24HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Huberty
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-23HouseAmended 1-Cain and S. Thompson
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB211 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB994
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00994I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00994H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00994E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00994S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00994F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB994&RcdVtNo=598&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB994&RcdVtNo=599&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB994&RcdVtNo=600&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB994&RcdVtNo=1944&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019

Bill Comments

feedback