TX HCR129 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Philip Wayne James of Arlington.
Title
In memory of Philip Wayne James of Arlington.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-03-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed |