TX HCR13 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating February 15 as Career and Technical Education Letter of Intent Signing Day for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Title
Designating February 15 as Career and Technical Education Letter of Intent Signing Day for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CAREER & TECHNICAL EDUCATION LETTER OF INTENT SIGNING DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates