TX HCR133 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to conduct a study on the creation of a divinity program at Texas Southern University.
Title
Directing the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to conduct a study on the creation of a divinity program at Texas Southern University.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. James Talarico [D] |
Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Adopted RV#1255 (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Adopted RV#1255 (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1255 |
2019-05-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY