TX HCR155 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of PermiaCare.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of PermiaCare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-29 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Filed |