TX HCR159 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Arlen L. Edgar on his induction into the Petroleum Hall of Fame.
Title
Congratulating Arlen L. Edgar on his induction into the Petroleum Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-04-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed |