TX HCR163 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 30th anniversary of the Allergan company's Waco Manufacturing Facility.
Title
Commemorating the 30th anniversary of the Allergan company's Waco Manufacturing Facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |