TX HCR171 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the Lipan Apache Tribe of Texas for its contributions to this state.
Title
Recognizing the Lipan Apache Tribe of Texas for its contributions to this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SCR61 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Signed by the Governor