TX HCR2 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing that pornography is a public health hazard.
Title
Recognizing that pornography is a public health hazard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |