TX HCR70 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the Hidalgo County Metropolitan Planning Organization to include Produce Road in the Hidalgo County MPO Thoroughfare Plan.
Title
Urging the Hidalgo County Metropolitan Planning Organization to include Produce Road in the Hidalgo County MPO Thoroughfare Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HCR70 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HC00070I.htm |