TX HJR11 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water Development Board to provide financial assistance for the development of certain projects in economically distressed areas.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water Development Board to provide financial assistance for the development of certain projects in economically distressed areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Adopted RV#312 (Y: 117 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#312 |
2019-04-11 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR79 (Similar To) 2019-05-28 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Subjects
BONDS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMICALLY DISTRESSED AREAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMICALLY DISTRESSED AREAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General