TX HJR12 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to increase the maximum bond amount authorized for the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to increase the maximum bond amount authorized for the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas.

Sponsors

Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]
Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]
Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]
Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Kirk Watson [D]Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Pat Fallon [R]Sen. Peter Flores [R]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]
Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Nathan Johnson [D]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]
Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. Borris Miles [D]Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Beverly Powell [D]
Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D]Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Royce West [D]Sen. John Whitmire [D]
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Adopted RV#423 (Y: 130 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14 Filed with the Secretary of State
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-06SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-03SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-01SenateReferred to Finance
2019-05-01SenateRead first time
2019-04-17SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#423
2019-04-16HouseAdopted
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-11HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback